U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00254
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Cusma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Judgment - Default]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Default Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.