U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00256
  • Case Name: Uhlry v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 25, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2015: [Letter]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 21, 2015: [Receipt]
  • July 21, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 13, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 10, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 10, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 10, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 10, 2015: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.