U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Barker v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Response (generic)]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 18, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • November 19, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 15, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 14, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 14, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 13, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • July 10, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.