U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00258
  • Case Name: Thies v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2016: [Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 14, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • October 14, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 14, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 13, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • July 12, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 12, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.