U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Gable v. ICC Mail Room Workers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • February 09, 2016: [Receipt]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 13, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 13, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 13, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.