U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Szanto v. College of Southern Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 25, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • August 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [ADR Plan]
  • March 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2015: [Consent Filed]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 13, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 14, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.