U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00268
  • Case Name: Martin v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Receipt]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 03, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Order]
  • September 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 17, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.