U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00267
  • Case Name: DeVan v. IDOC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 25, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 24, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Reconsideration]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Receipt]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Request]
  • February 18, 2016: [Issuance]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 26, 2016: [Service]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Letter]
  • December 04, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 04, 2015: [Withdraw]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Letter]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Dismiss]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 15, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.