U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Moore v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [USCA Order]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 14, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 19, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 20, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 20, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.