U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Winebarger v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • October 15, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 21, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 21, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 21, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • July 21, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.