U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00283
  • Case Name: Vasquez v. RTR 1, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 26, 2016: [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 29, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 28, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 09, 2015: [Consent Filed]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.