U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00285
  • Case Name: Wood v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Dismiss]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 27, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 27, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 27, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 26, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 24, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • July 24, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 24, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 24, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 24, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.