U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00286
  • Case Name: McKinnon et al v. ES-O-EN Corp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2018: [Protective Order]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 11, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [ADR Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 19, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 18, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 06, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • June 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.