U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00422
  • Case Name: Grist v. Wengler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Order Reopening Case]
  • October 06, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.