U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00288
  • Case Name: Pacheco v. Gold Emblem Produce, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 30, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 20, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 11, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 10, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.