U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00290
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Real Property located at 424 East Elgin Street, Caldwell,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 02, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Service by Publication]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 25, 2015: [Claim]
  • November 23, 2015: [Claim]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.