U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00292
  • Case Name: Davis et al v. Finemark National Bank & Trust
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 21, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 06, 2016: [Appear]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Errata]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 03, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 27, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 27, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • October 27, 2015: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 20, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 28, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 25, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • September 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 25, 2015: [Stay]
  • September 22, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 01, 2015: [Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 28, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 11, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 29, 2015: [Supplement]
  • July 29, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.