U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00295
  • Case Name: Sokoli v. J&M Sanitation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 24, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 18, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 14, 2015: [Order]
  • September 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 14, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 11, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 28, 2015: [Stay]
  • August 24, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • August 03, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.