U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00297
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Carlin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Consent Filed]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Receipt]
  • July 31, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 31, 2015: [Stay]
  • July 31, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 31, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.