U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00296
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Nez Perce County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • December 13, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2017: [Declaration]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Staying Case]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 27, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 31, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 24, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 24, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Receipt]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • September 08, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 04, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 04, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 11, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 31, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 31, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 31, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.