U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00301
  • Case Name: Trotter v. Bayview Loan Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • December 15, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 15, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 11, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 05, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 02, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 02, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 04, 2015: [Summons Issued]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 28, 2015: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 04, 2015: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • August 04, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 04, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 04, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.