U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00302
  • Case Name: Hobbs v. United States Office of Personnel Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order CTO]
  • October 23, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 19, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 20, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 14, 2015: [Stay]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 05, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 05, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 05, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 05, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 04, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.