U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00300
  • Case Name: O'Brien v Abey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Status Report]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Relief]
  • May 04, 2016: [Compel]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order]
  • September 22, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 21, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 16, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 11, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.