U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00299
  • Case Name: Bales v. Ada County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 21, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 16, 2016: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • November 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • August 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • May 06, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 31, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 13, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 02, 2015: [Dismiss]
October, 2015
  • October 12, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 02, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 04, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 24, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 18, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.