U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00305
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • February 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • January 05, 2016: [Receipt]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Extension of Time to Amend]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 09, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 09, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 02, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 02, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Letter]
  • September 10, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order]
  • September 09, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Letter]
  • August 06, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 06, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.