U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00304
  • Case Name: Ellis v. Corizon Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Reconsideration]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 12, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 19, 2018: [Joinder]
  • November 19, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 13, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sanctions]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Errata]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 30, 2018: [Strike]
  • August 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • August 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Seal Document]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2018: [Errata]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 13, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • July 05, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 04, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 18, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 17, 2018: [Stay]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Status Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 15, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 18, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 21, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 18, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 15, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 13, 2017: [Strike]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 30, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2016: [Errata]
  • April 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Reconsideration]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 12, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • January 11, 2016: [Receipt]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 06, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 06, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 06, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 06, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.