U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Parker et al v. USDA Forest Service, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [ADR Plan]
  • April 21, 2016: [ADR Plan]
  • April 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 20, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 22, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 07, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 07, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • August 07, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.