U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00308
  • Case Name: Hogan et al v. Idaho Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Receipt]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Reconsideration]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 26, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • August 07, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 07, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 07, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.