U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00310
  • Case Name: Dutra et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
  • August 27, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order CTO]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 10, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 07, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • August 07, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.