U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00309
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Hodges Enterprises of Idaho #6, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 05, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2015
  • August 16, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 16, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.