U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00311
  • Case Name: Estate of James Lee DiMaggio et al v. Six Unknown FBI Agents et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 22, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 02, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
  • April 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2018: [Stay]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [USCA Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 30, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 30, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
  • March 31, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 02, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 07, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 19, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 16, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 10, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.