U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00312
  • Case Name: WESTMORELAND v. WELLS FARGO BANK NORTHWEST N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • July 11, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • June 30, 2017: [Settlement]
  • June 14, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 16, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Protective Order]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Errata]
  • January 09, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 06, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 06, 2017: [Declaration]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2016: [Declaration]
  • December 06, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Declaration]
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Compel]
  • August 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 21, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • July 21, 2016: [Relief]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 12, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
  • June 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • April 13, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 28, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 18, 2015: [Consent Filed]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 06, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 15, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 15, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 10, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.