U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00307
  • Case Name: Peterson v. Severe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 28, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2015: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order]
  • August 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 25, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 11, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 11, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.