U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00313
  • Case Name: Kaptein v. BMC West Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2016: [In Limine]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 02, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 07, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Summons Reissued]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.