U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00318
  • Case Name: Green v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • December 09, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 14, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • August 13, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • August 13, 2015: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.