U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00317
  • Case Name: Intermountain Fair Housing Council, Inc. v. Law Property Management, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Consent Decree]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 12, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 10, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 05, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 21, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 13, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 13, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.