U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00322
  • Case Name: Oquendo et al v. City of Boise et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [ADR Plan]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • August 14, 2015: [Waive]
  • August 14, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.