U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00321
  • Case Name: Jackman v. International Engineering Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • July 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 30, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 29, 2016: [Produce]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 25, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 14, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.