U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00320
  • Case Name: Stanton v. International Engineering Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 03, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order]
  • November 30, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 25, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 25, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Order]
  • August 18, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 14, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.