U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00324
  • Case Name: McClure v. Lincoln County Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 21, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Joint Mediation Statement]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 07, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2016: [Reconsideration]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 30, 2016: [Transcript]
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 24, 2016: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • March 10, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 14, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2015: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • October 08, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Supplement]
  • September 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 21, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2015: [Supplement]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.