U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00325
  • Case Name: Tharpe v. Tuesday Morning, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [ADR Plan]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 08, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 08, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • December 07, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.