U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Jimenez-Trejo v. Clements et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
  • July 10, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Exclude]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [ADR Plan]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 03, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 11, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 21, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.