U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00332
  • Case Name: Cody v. Del Rios
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Request]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Request]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 04, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 04, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2015: [Letter]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 19, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 19, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.