U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00250
  • Case Name: Lau v. U.S. Department of Agriculture
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 09, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2015: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 06, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.