U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Blake v. Silva
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 07, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 20, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 20, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.