U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00335
  • Case Name: Caribou County v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2017: [Stay]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2017: [Vacate]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 07, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 07, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • January 13, 2017: [Settlement]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 26, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 08, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 05, 2016: [Consent Filed]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 18, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 24, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 23, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 20, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 18, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 30, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 21, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 21, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 21, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.