U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:83-cv-04179
  • Case Name: Idaho, State of, et al v. M.A. Hanna Mining Co, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Disbursement of Funds]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Return Mail]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • October 26, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • October 22, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Return Mail]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • September 25, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 21, 2015: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.