U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00338
  • Case Name: US Ecology Idaho, Inc. v. Environmental Chemical Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 26, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 25, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 24, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.