U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00340
  • Case Name: Addison v. Ada County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Return Mail]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2017: [Protective Order]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • March 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Statement]
  • December 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement]
  • November 14, 2016: [Declaration]
  • November 14, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 25, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 25, 2016: [In Limine]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 22, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 24, 2015: [Errata]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 27, 2015: [Errata]
  • August 25, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.