U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00336
  • Case Name: Wells v. Jerome County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 25, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.